Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lobel, Gary Dean, against Petty, Tiffany, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 20, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: March 20, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 20, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: June 25, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 20, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: July 06, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 10, 2018Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: June 25, 2018Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: August 06, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 08, 2019Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino
Date: April 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00. |
|
March 20, 2019 | |||
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
September 21, 2018 | |||
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 180807-0943-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180807-0943-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 1090436 | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $6.71) |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 2274.57 ) 180806-0692-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180806-0692-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 1090435 |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., ORDERED ENTERED 07/06/18 JUDGMENT FOR: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., JUDGMENT AGAINST: TIFFANY PETTY JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,658.22 INTEREST $120.64 ATTORNEY FEES $189.00 COSTS $275.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2242.86 - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.