Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
De La Rosa, Cesar, Pablo, Atanacio, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Employee Justice Legal Group, Llp, against Coveris Flexibles Us Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, Ramos, Milton, Transcontinental Us Llc, represented by Ford & Harrison Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Thomas S. Garza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2018 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Notice Imaged
Date: October 02, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: May 05, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 07, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: October 05, 2018At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: January 03, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 28, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: February 22, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 22, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 22, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 13, 2018At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 07, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 22, 2018Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 13, 2021Motion re:
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: April 06, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: May 19, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.