Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Beecher, Michael W, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mansour Law Group, Aplc, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien Or, Heyen, Melinda, Hovey, William L., The Testate And Intestate Successors Of William L Hovey, Deceased, And All Persons, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet M Frangie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 26, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: May 15, 2018Application for Order for Publication or Posting of
Date: June 07, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 26, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 26, 2018Application for Order for Publication or Posting of
Date: June 07, 2018Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: June 12, 2018Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: June 12, 2018Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: August 21, 2018Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: October 18, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 22, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: May 22, 2019Proof of Publication re:
Date: November 01, 2019Application for Order for Publication or Posting of
Date: June 20, 2019Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: August 16, 2019Exhibits List Filed
Date: January 31, 2020Receipt for Records filed
Date: January 31, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: January 31, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 04, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 09, 2048Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2048 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
October 09, 2048 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CAN NOT DEFAULT UNKNOWN DOES, CORRECT AND RESUBMIT . |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): FAXED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGMENT ENTERED. |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibits List Filed EXHIBIT LIST FILED. |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR RECORDS FILED. | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER AND JUDGMENT FILED |
|
January 31, 2020 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY MICHAEL W BEECHER FOR CERTIFIED COPIES 200131-0280-MC MJX/ 40.00 PAYMT 200131-0280-MC REFERENCE NUMBER 06374T | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLAINTIFF'S PROVE UP HEARING BRIEF FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.