Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Conrado, Diego, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Office Of Gerald L Friend, The Dolan Law Firm, Law Offices Of Gerard L Friend, against Cls Landscaping Management, Inc, Espinoza Gonzalez, Jose Juan, represented by Greines Martin Stein & Richland, Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland, Llp, Law Offices Of Muhar, Garber, Av & Duncan, Olson, Robert Axel, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 06, 2020Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: December 12, 2022Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Order signed and Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 28, 2022Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed
Date: August 02, 2022Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Notice
Date: June 21, 2022Stipulation Filed re:
Date: August 03, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 04, 2020Exhibits List Filed
Date: March 05, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 11, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 13, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Reply Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 10, 2019Reply Filed
Date: July 25, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 18, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 30, 2018Answer Filed
Date: May 18, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: October 11, 2018Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 03, 2018Answer Filed
Date: January 19, 2018Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: April 11, 2018Witness List Filed
Date: March 05, 2020Trial Brief Filed
Date: March 05, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Ex Parte Filed
Date: February 05, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 13, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: February 13, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: August 01, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: November 29, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 25, 2019Objection Filed
Date: July 25, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 25, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 17, 2018At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: May 17, 2018At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: May 21, 2018At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: September 14, 2018At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: January 22, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 18, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 28, 2020Witness List Filed
Date: February 28, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 28, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 26, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 03, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 27, 2020Memorandum of Costs
Date: January 20, 2022Motion re:
Date: January 20, 2022Jury Fees Posted
Date: January 27, 2022Objection Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Objection Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: February 04, 2022Motion for Relief
Date: February 08, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Motion for Relief
Date: February 18, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Reply Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: February 24, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: November 29, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 29, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: November 29, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 29, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 04, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 02, 2018Notice Filed
Date: March 04, 2022Motion re:
Date: March 08, 2022Reply Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: March 25, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: April 11, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 11, 2022Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: April 11, 2022Reply Filed
Date: April 11, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 12, 2022Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed
Date: April 20, 2022Letter Sent To:
Date: April 21, 2022Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed
Date: May 02, 2022Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: May 04, 2022Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed
Date: May 10, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 10, 2022Judgment Filed
Date: May 10, 2022Amended Notice to Reporter For Estimate of Costs filed/maile
Date: May 10, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: May 16, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 17, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 25, 2022Motion for New Trial
Date: May 25, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: May 26, 2022Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: May 27, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: June 13, 2022Reply Filed
Date: June 13, 2022Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: June 20, 2022Notice
Date: June 23, 2022Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 11, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 25, 2022Letter Sent To:
Date: August 03, 2022Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: August 12, 2022Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: August 24, 2022Notice of Delivery of Appeal Record
Date: September 27, 2022Notice of Delivery of Appeal Record
Date: October 06, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: May 18, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 15, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 06, 2020Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 23, 2020Notice Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 13, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 06, 2021Objection Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Motions in Limine Opposition Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 22, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 22, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 22, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 22, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 22, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 22, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: October 22, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 25, 2021Reporter's Fees Paid in the Amount of:
Date: November 01, 2021Exhibits List Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Reporter's Fees Paid in the Amount of:
Date: November 01, 2021Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 01, 2021Jury Fees Posted
Date: November 03, 2021Motion Filed Re:
Date: November 10, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 12, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 29, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Reporter's Fees Paid in the Amount of:
Date: December 02, 2021Jury Fees Posted
Date: December 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Verdict(s) form filed.
Date: December 02, 2021Jury Fees Posted
Date: December 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Reporter's Fees Paid in the Amount of:
Date: December 02, 2021Jury Fees Posted
Date: December 02, 2021Objection Filed
Date: December 10, 2021Exhibits List Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Motion re:
Date: December 22, 2021Motion re:
Date: December 22, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of
Date: December 22, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 23, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: December 23, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Objection Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: January 13, 2022Reply Filed
Date: January 19, 2022Reply Filed
Date: January 19, 2022Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address Filed | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery of Appeal Record | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Record on Appeal Certified to Reviewing Court & Parties | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Reporters Transcripts on Appeal Received | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Delivery of Appeal Record | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Record on Appeal Certified to Reviewing Court & Parties | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed Supplemental Transcript |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
GC70632- Reporters Transcript Trust Fee PAID |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.