Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mandarich Law Group Llp, against Hernandez, Priscilla, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2017 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: December 18, 2017Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: November 30, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 30, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 30, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: October 30, 2017Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: October 30, 2017Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: November 17, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2018 | |||
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE ALREADY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON 4/11/18. |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
April 30, 2018 | |||
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PRISCILLA HERNANDEZ WITH COSTS OF $65.00 |
|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PRISCILLA HERNANDEZ WITH COSTS OF $65.00 |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PRISCILLA HERNANDEZ WITH COSTS OF $65.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.