Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Diaz, Atilio, Smith, Larry, Fawcett, Cristine Jazmin, Gurrola, Sofia Rivas, Wasch, John R.T, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by The Barnes Firm I.C., Vargas, Fernando Davin, against Fawcett, Cristine Jazmin, Gurrola, Sofia Rivas, Romero, Noe, Wasch, John R.T, represented by Abeltin & Migoya Llp, Freeburg & Nettels, Law Offices Of Santa Cruz, Brownwood & Cannon, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M. Tomberlin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 25, 2017 |
CategoryPi Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions600 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time974 days |
Notice Imaged
Date: April 28, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 19, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 01, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: March 01, 2018Summons Issued on
Date: February 02, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 25, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: June 17, 2019Summons Issued on
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 13, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 20, 2017Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: December 26, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 04, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: July 13, 2018Summons Issued on
Date: July 12, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 08, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: April 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 01, 2018Summons Issued on
Date: March 01, 2018Summons Issued on
Date: December 04, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 08, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 25, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: October 25, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 25, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2020 | |||
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL JOHN M TOMBERLIN,JUDGE CLERK: AMIE ARROYO COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ;12225 COURT ATTENDANT M PERRYMAN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY DONALD MATEJKA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ATILIO DIAZ. ATTORNEY JAMES ABELTIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SOFIA RIVAS GURROLA, NOE ROMERO. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COUNSEL REPRESENT MATTER IS READY TO BE DISMISSED - ON COUNSEL'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) - ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCDM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33. |
|
May 04, 2020 | |||
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
On the Courts own Motion, the Court Continues This Matter re ON THE COURTS OWN MOTION, THE COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER PURS. TO GEN. ORDER OF TRHE PRESIDING JUDGE IN RE: IMPLEMENTATIN OF EMERGENCY RELIEF AUTHORIZED PURS. GC6815 BY CHAIR OF JUDICIAL COUNCIL. |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
On Court's Motion, Hearing Previously Set is Ordered Reset ON COURT'S MOTION, THE OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING PRESENTLY SET IN THIS CASE, IS ORDERED RESET FOR 06/25/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33. NOTICE SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD. |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCDM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/04/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.