Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cir Law Offices Internation Llp, against Tackett, Rebecca Rose, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2017 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 23, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 06, 2018Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: January 25, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: October 23, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 23, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 23, 2017Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: April 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2018 | |||
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 23, 2018 | |||
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY, ASSOCIATION FILED BY DISCOVER BANK. |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO REBECCA ROSE TACKETT WITH COSTS OF $79.00 |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,385.12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.