Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc As Assignee Of Synchrony Bank Fka Ge, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, Apc, against Elizabeth, Guillen, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2017 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 23, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: October 23, 2017Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: December 12, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 23, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2018 | |||
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 23, 2018 | |||
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLAINTIFF'S OSC RESPONSE RE: SERVICE COMPLETION FILED. |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR FAX FILING FEE 180403-0928-MC FAX/ 4.00 PAYMT 180403-0928-MC REFERENCE NUMBER #033-0061442503 | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO GUILLEN ELIZABETH WITH COSTS OF $75.00 |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.