Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nelson & Kennard, against Thompson, Nancy L, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Lynn M. Poncin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2017 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time564 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 19, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 19, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: October 19, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 19, 2017Legacy Minutes
Date: October 23, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 22, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: March 07, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: December 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2019 | |||
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS/STATUS SETTLEMENT (CCP 664.6) |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE FOR SANCTIONS 190412-0648-CK FSA/ 580.00 PAYMT 190412-0648-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 49529 | |
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Department Changed DEFAULT DPT. CHANGED FROM DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM S16J TO S16. TO . |
|
March 07, 2019 |
Judge: Poncin, Lynn |
||
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS/STATUS SETTLEMENT (CCP 664.6) LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK: ILAYALI WADE COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT T MEJIA - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:33 - HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF SPECIALLY APPEARING COUNSEL. REASON: ADDITIONAL TIME NEEDED TO FINALIZE THE SETTLEMENT. - THE COURT INQUIRES OF COUNSEL REGARDING THE UNPAID SANCTIONS PREVIOUSLY IMPOSED ON 12/27/18. - SPECIALLY APPEARING COUNSEL REPRESENTS HE DOES NOT HAVE AN UPDATE ON THE STATUS OF PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS. - DUE TO THE NON-TIMELY PAYMENT OF THE PREVIOUSLY IMPOSED SANCTIONS, THE COURT DOUBLES THE PREVIOUSLY IMPOSED SANCTIONS OF $290.00 TO $580.00 - TOTAL AMOUNT OF SANCTIONS NOW DUE ARE AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IN THE AMOUNT OF $$580.00 PAYABLE TO SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT ON OR BEFORE 04/09/19. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/13/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S16. CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. 08:35 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
December 27, 2018 |
Judge: Poncin, Lynn |
||
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:TERMINAL SANCTIONS/STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK: ILAYALI WADE COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:51 - PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL APOLOGIZES FOR THE FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE LAST TWO HEARINGS AND IS AWARE THE PREVIOUSLY IMPOSED SANCTIONS OF $290.00 IS OUTSTANDING. - COUNSEL FURTHER REPRESENTS THE PARTIES HAVE REACHED A SETTLEMENT IN THIS CASE AND IS CURRENTLY WAITING FOR DEFENDANT, NANCY THOMPSON, TO SIGN AND RETURN THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. - BASED ON COUNSEL'S REPRESENTATIONS, THE COURT DECLINES TO DOUBLE THE PREVIOUSLY IMPOSED SANCTIONS. - THE COURT ORDERS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO PAY THE PREVIOUSLY IMPOSED SANCTIONS OF $290.00 ON OR BEFORE 1/29/19 TO THE SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS/STATUS SETTLEMENT (CCP 664.6) SET FOR 03/07/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S16. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. 08:53 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
November 26, 2018 |
Judge: Poncin, Lynn |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.