Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Deer Park Development Corporaiton, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reid & Hellyer, against Dubar, Thomas Courtney, Herb And Development, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Needles Public Utility Authority Of The City Of Needles, A California Public, The City Of Needles, A Municipal Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2017 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 23, 2017Summons Issued on
Date: October 23, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: October 23, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 23, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: November 01, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: November 07, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: November 21, 2017Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: December 18, 2017Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: December 18, 2017Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: February 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
April 23, 2018 | |||
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT BY THOMAS COURTNEY DUBAR WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/08/17 FILED | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT FILED AS TO THOMAS COURTNEY DUBAR. PARTY SERVED ON 11/21/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECIEPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00. |
|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action REQUEST FOR DISMISAL FILED AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY AS TO THOMAS COURTNEY DUBAR, HERB AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA, THE CITY OF NEEDLES, A MUNICIPAL, NEEDLES PUBLIC UTILITY AUTHORITY OF THE, CAUSE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION(DECLARATORY/INJUNCTIVE), WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action REQUEST FOR DISMISAL FILED AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY AS TO THE CITY OF NEEDLES, A MUNICIPAL, CAUSE THIRD, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action REQUEST FOR DISMISAL FILED AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION ONLY AS TO DEER PARK DEVELOPMENT CORPORAITON, INC.,, CAUSE 2, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.