Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ghorab, Mary, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Law Office Of James A Jensen, against 99 Cents Stores Only, Llc, represented by Koppel Litigation And Mediation,Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Gilbert G. Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2017 |
CategoryPi Personal Injury Not Mv |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time752 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 02, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 02, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: October 02, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 02, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: April 02, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: March 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2019 | |||
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
October 15, 2019 | |||
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:00 HOURS. |
|
October 10, 2019 | |||
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes READINESS CALENDAR |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33. |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S33. |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MARY GHORAB. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.