Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Silva, Jennifer Marie, filed a(n) Assault And Battery case represented by The Blue Law Group, Inc., against F & M Radiology Medical Center, Inc A California Medical Corporation, Heikali, Moosa, Tabibian M.D., Bahram, represented by Law Office Of Konrad Kuenstler, Law Offices Of Konrad Kuenstler, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Wilfred J. Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2017 |
CategoryAssault And Battery |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time613 days |
Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 18, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 02, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 02, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: October 02, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 02, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 18, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 18, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 24, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 24, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: December 10, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 24, 2018Declaration re:
Date: January 16, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: December 10, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: December 10, 2018Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: January 16, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 16, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: February 27, 2019Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: June 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2019 | |||
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL DUE TO COUNSELS' FAILURE TO APPEAR |
|
June 10, 2019 | |||
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JENNIFER MARIE SILVA |
|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY F & M RADIOLOGY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. |
|
June 06, 2019 |
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes READINESS CALENDAR WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR.,JUDGE CLERK: KIM ALLAIN COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THE COURT FINDS NO NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED AND COUNSEL HAVE FAILED TO APPEAR THIS DATE. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL DUE TO COUNSELS' FAILURE TO APPEAR SET FOR 07/09/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
February 27, 2019 |
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL (011619) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JENNIFER MARIE SILVA WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR.,JUDGE CLERK: KIM ALLAIN COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY CHRISTIAN OVERFIELD PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. - MOTION JENNIFER MARIE SILVA'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD. IS HEARD. PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED. COUNSEL SUBMITS ON PLEADINGS. - COURT FINDS: JENNIFER MARIE SILVA'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL IS GRANTED. ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. COURT INFORMS COUNSEL THAT THE ORDER/RULING IS NOT EFFECTIVE UNTIL COUNSEL SERVES THE ORDER ON PLAINTIFF AND DEFENSE COUNSEL AND FILES A COPY OF THE SERVED ORDER (W/ PROOF OF SERVICE) AND PLAINTIFF'S ADDRESS AND NOTICE OF THE NEXT HEARING WITH THE COURT. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.