Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Landmark Paving, Inc. A California Corporation, Western National Mutual Insurance Company A Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Operini, Edward G, against Castorena Property Repair Services, Inc., Western National Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Law Offices Of Hausman & Sosa Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael M. Dest presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 02, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty (Ltd - 10K To 25K) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time337 days |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 20, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 02, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 02, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 02, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 20, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: October 02, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: January 04, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 15, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: January 04, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 15, 2017Legacy Minutes
Date: July 03, 2018Summons Issued on
Date: February 26, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: April 02, 2018Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: August 30, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: September 04, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2018 | |||
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF LANDMARK PAVING, INC. A CALIFORNIA FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF LANDMARK PAVING, INC. A CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 09/04/18 JUDGMENT FOR: LANDMARK PAVING, INC. A CALIFORNIA JUDGMENT AGAINST: CASTORENA PROPERTYREPAIR SERVICES, INC. JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $11,450.00 INTEREST $1,007.86 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $475.15 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $12933.01 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON CASTORENA PROPERTYREPAIR SERVICES, INC.. |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY LANDMARK PAVING, INC. A CALIFORNIA | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed CASE SUMMARY FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT ON DECLARATIONS FILED. |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 10/04/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S16J | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 10/04/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17 - RESCHEDULED TO: | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Re-Assign Sent to Counsel of Record, Re-Assign CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S16J FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.