Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Mcneil, Thomas, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Pro Se, against Union Supply Direct, represented by Tucker Ellis Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael M. Dest presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 02, 2017 |
CategoryFraud (Ltd) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions190 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time338 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 02, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: October 02, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 02, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: April 02, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: October 05, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 31, 2017Legacy Minutes
Date: April 02, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 10, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 02, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: July 03, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: July 03, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: September 05, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 10, 2018Motion Filed
Date: August 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2018 | |||
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THOMAS MCNEIL |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY UNION SUPPLY DIRECT. |
|
September 05, 2018 | |||
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes EX PARTE HEARING RE: ENTRY OF DISMISSAL/ORD VACATING HEARING MICHAEL M DEST,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: THOMAS MCNEIL JOHN K. SON, REPRESENTATIVE OF UNION SUPPLY DIRECT PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:54 EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT : - COURT FINDS: PLAINTIFF WAS PREVIOUSLY GRANTED LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION. PLAINTIFF HAS FAILED TO DO SO AND THE TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT HAS FAR EXCEEDED THE TIME THE COURT ALLOWED. EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED EX PARTE ORDER SIGNED BY THE COURT. ON DEFENDANT'S OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: COURT'S RULING ON DEFENDANT'S EXPARTE MOTION. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. JUDGMENT SIGNED IN OPEN COURT ACTION - COMPLETE 08:56 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT FILED |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Filed EX PARTE ENTRY OF DISMISSAL/ORD VACATING HEARING DATE FILED. |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY UNION SUPPLY DIRECT FOR EX-PARTE FEES 180831-0150-CK MMF/ 60.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 180831-0150-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 174004 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.