Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Barreras, Sara D, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2017 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 18, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 30, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: September 18, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 18, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 18, 2017Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: December 11, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2018 | |||
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OR DISCHARGE- CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
March 19, 2018 | |||
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY CHAPTER 7 FILED BY SARA D BARRERAS. |
|
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SARA D BARRERAS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $59.50 FILED. |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.