Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Craig, Frank, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against R.W. Zant Co, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McCarville, Brian S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcCarville, Brian S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2017 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Motion to Compel Production of Documents
Date: January 26, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: January 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Balance Due on Case $20.00 for stip/Order to continue OSC re Dismissal |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Unconditional) | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
READINESS CALENDAR
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes READINESS CALENDAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.