Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Austin, Ronald, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Borchert, Brent John, against Corporation, Pilot, Pilot Travel Center, Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David S. Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2017 |
CategoryBusiness Tort-Complex |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: June 27, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 27, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 27, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: June 27, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 06, 2017Summons Issued on
Date: July 03, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 25, 2017Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: December 18, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2017 | |||
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOTICE OF LIEN ON PROCEEDS ON JUDGMENT FILED. |
|
September 21, 2017 |
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA;12612 COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY BRENT BORCHERT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR RONALD AUSTIN. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD ACTION CAME ON FOR COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. - HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. REASON: TO EFFECT SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/20/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RONALD AUSTIN. | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL: COPY OF SUMMONS, NTC OF CASE ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM BRENT J BORCHERT. | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | CORRECT CASE NAME. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.