Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
H., Bryanna, Heredia, Bryan, Heredia, Victoria, H., Isabell, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Jensen & Associates Apc, against County Of San Bernardino, A Public Entity, Madriz, Carmen, Madriz, Monique, Rialto Unified District, A Public Entity, represented by Fagen Friedman & Fulfrost Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Gilbert G. Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert G. Ochoa Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2017 |
CategoryPi Personal Injury Not Mv |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions329 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time647 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The case number is CIVDS1710300. The plaintiff/petitioner is Heredia and the defendant/respondent is Madriz. The request for dismissal can be made with or without prejudice. The form also pro...
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles
Date: May 26, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 26, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 26, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 07, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: May 04, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 23, 2019Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: March 11, 2019Bench Warrant Recalled
Date: June 25, 2019Request to Set Uncontested Matter Filed
Date: January 11, 2019Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: March 26, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: November 27, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 13, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: June 23, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: June 02, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: November 06, 2018Statement of Damages Filed
Date: November 06, 2018Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: November 27, 2017At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: November 17, 2017Petition & Order for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: August 04, 2017Petition & Order for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: August 04, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 02, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 02, 2017Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 30, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 20, 2021Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 25, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.