Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Tung, Hui Ping, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Law Offices Of Richard A Kolber, against All Persons Unkown Claiming Any Interest Inthe Property, Named As Does 1-10, Inclusive, Cathay Bank A California Banking Corporation, Yim, Yat Fan, represented by Consumer Litigation Law Center, Apc, Frandzel Robins Bloom & Csato, Lc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Thomas S. Garza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas S. Garza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time386 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 17, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 17, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: April 17, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 17, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 25, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 03, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 10, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: July 18, 2017Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: September 19, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 01, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 21, 2017Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: April 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2018 | |||
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. |
|
September 20, 2018 | |||
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes READINESS CALENDAR |
|
May 29, 2018 | |||
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
April 12, 2018 | |||
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.