Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tung, Hui Ping, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Law Offices Of Richard A Kolber, against All Persons Unkown Claiming Any Interest Inthe Property, Named As Does 1-10, Inclusive, East West Bank, Yim, Yat Fan, represented by Consumer Litigation Law Center, Apc, East West Investment, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Thomas S. Garza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas S. Garza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time386 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 17, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 17, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 17, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: April 17, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 03, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 10, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: July 18, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 19, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 21, 2017Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: April 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2018 | |||
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. |
|
September 20, 2018 | |||
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes READINESS CALENDAR |
|
May 29, 2018 | |||
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL | |
April 12, 2018 | |||
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.