Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wong, Richard, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Law Offices Of Brian Cullen, against 16481 Garnet Way Partnership, Castaneda, Ron, Jovel, Jesus C, Miran, Florido, Molano, Norcia, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Thomas S. Garza presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 01, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions142 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time212 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 01, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 01, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: March 01, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 01, 2017Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: May 15, 2017Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: May 15, 2017Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: May 15, 2017Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: May 15, 2017Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: May 15, 2017Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: May 15, 2017Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: May 15, 2017Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: May 15, 2017Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: May 15, 2017Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: June 23, 2017Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: June 23, 2017Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: June 23, 2017Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: June 23, 2017Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: June 23, 2017Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: June 23, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 23, 2017Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: June 23, 2017Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: June 23, 2017Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: June 23, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 21, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 11, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: August 15, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: August 17, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2017 |
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed JUDGMENT TO QUIET TITLE FILED. |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: DEFAULT PROVE-UP THOMAS S. GARZA,JUDGE CLERK: SULMA TORRES COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID;11053 COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY BRIAN CULLEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PLAINTIFF RICHARD WONG PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD ACTION CAME ON FOR DEFAULT PROVE UP. WITNESS -- RICHARD WONG (PLAINTIFF) IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. OLIVIA WONG IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF. COURT INQUIRES FROM PLAINTIFF AND COUNSEL COURT ORDERS CORPORATION GRANT DEED DATED NOVEMBER 20, 2003 ENTERED INTO EVIDENCE AND MARKED AS EXHIBIT #1 FOR THE PLAINTIFF. AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT : - COURT FINDS: COURT TAKES JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ALL NAMED DEFENDANT BEING SERVED PROPERLY BY PUBLICATION AND DEFAULTS BEING ENTERED. JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RICHARD WONG ORDERED ENTERED 09/29/17 JUDGMENT FOR: RICHARD WONG COURT FINDS RICHARD WONG, PLAINTIFF IN THIS ACTION, IS THE OWNDER OF AN UNDIVIDED FEE SIMPLE INTEREST IN JOINT TENANCY WITH HIS WIFE OLIVIA WONG, TO THE REAL PROPERTY DESCRIBED AS: 16481 GARNET WAY, CHINO HILLS, CA 91709-4925. COURT FURTHER ORDERS ALL PRIOR DEEDS CANCELLED. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
August 30, 2017 |
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE THOMAS S. GARZA,JUDGE CLERK: SULMA TORRES COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID;11053 COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY BRIAN CULLEN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR DEFAULT PTOVE-UP AS FOLLOWS: - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:DEFAULT PROVE-UP SET FOR 09/29/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S27. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF RICHARD WONG IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY CCP 585(D) FILED |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON PABLO J PANAMENO, JESUS C JOVEL, NORCIA MOLANO, FLORIDO MIRAN, ALFONSO SALAS JR, RON CASTANEDA, URIEL PEREZ, THE 16481 GARNET WAY TRUST, 16481 GARNET WAY PARTNERSHIP. |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST THE 16481 GARNET WAY TRUST FILED. |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RICHARD WONG AS TO THE 16481 GARNET WAY TRUST. |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLAITNIFF'S CRC 388 CASE SUMMARY FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.