Jacks, Jennifer,
filed a(n)
Personal Injury -
Torts
case
represented by
Law Offices Of Patrica A Law,
against
Valadez, Arturo,
represented by
Fullerton, Lemann, Schaefer & Dominick,
in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
This case was filed in
San Bernardino County
Superior Courts
San Bernardino with Bryan F. Foster presiding.
Case Details for
Jacks, Jennifer v. Valadez, Arturo
Case Events for
Jacks, Jennifer v. Valadez, Arturo
Date
Type
Description
December 11, 2020
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Foster, Bryan
December 11, 2020
Docket Event
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SANCTIONS(PLTF CNSL FTA)/VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT
October 20, 2020
Docket Event
Declaration Filed of Stacy K Brigham Re: OSC Re FTA
October 09, 2020
Judge: Foster, Bryan
October 09, 2020
Docket Event
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 06/26/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22. BRYAN F FOSTER,JUDGE CLERK: PATRICIA GUERRERO COURT REPORTER TAMOI TOMLINSON;13864 COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: 09:07 POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE OR PROOF OF DEPOSIT SUBMITTED, THE COURT ORDERS THE BENCH WARRANT ISSUED. BENCH WARRANT ISSUED FOR JENNIFER JACKS. BAIL SET AT 3300.00.MAY NOT FORFEIT. - THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF COUNSEL, THE COURT CONTINUES THE MATTER AND SETS A HEARING AS FOLLOWS: - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS(PLTF CNSL FTA)/VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 12/11/20 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT S22. CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 10/09/20 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===
October 02, 2020
Docket Event
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF STACY K. BRIGHAM RE:OSC RE: VERIF. OF DEPOSIT FILED
October 02, 2020
Docket Event
FILING FEE PAID BY JENNIFER JACKS FOR FAX AND POSTAGE FEE 201102-0219-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.55 PAYMT 201102-0219-VS TSB/ 0.02 FAX/ 6.00 PAYMT 201102-0219-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 035-0042448043
October 01, 2020
Docket Event
CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 035-0042903922
October 01, 2020
Docket Event
FILING FEE PAID BY JENNIFER JACKS FOR FAX 201103-0337-VS FAX/ 6.00 PAYMT