Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Caudillo, Nick, Nicholas Realty Inca Coproration, Grillo, Alfred, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Myer, Phillip Isaac, against Caudillo, Nick, Coldwell Banker A Business Entity Form Unknown, Flores, Romie, Hasse, Elisa M, Nicholas Realty Inca Coproration, (total of 6) See All represented by Horton, Oberrecht & Kirkpatrick, The Bailey Legal Group, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Bryan F. Foster presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBryan F. Foster Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 26, 2016 |
CategoryFraud |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions544 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time558 days |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 13, 2016Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 19, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 26, 2016Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 26, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: August 26, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 26, 2016Summons Issued on
Date: January 18, 2017Motion Filed
Date: February 14, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 14, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: February 15, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 14, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 14, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 15, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: March 16, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: February 13, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 07, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 180515-0047-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180515-0047-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 2927 | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER GRANTED ACCEPTING MEMO OF COST FILED ON 2/26/18 AND ISSUE ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT FILED |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Action Filed REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION/COURT ORDER RE: GRANTING MEMO OF COST AND ISSUING ABSTRACTOF JUDGMENT SENT DEPARTMENT S22 FOR REVIEW. |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Action Filed REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION/COURT ORDER RE: ATTORNEY'S REQUEST TO FILEABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT SENT DEPARTMENT S22 FOR REVIEW. |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL: NTC OF RETURN OF DOC (ORDR AFTER HRG) RECEIVED BACK FROM PHILLIP MYER APC. | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ORD AFTER HRG ON MTN TO DISMISS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER COURTROOM, ENTIRE CASE WAS DISMISSED ON 03/07/18. |
|
March 07, 2018 |
Judge: Foster, Bryan |
||
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF ARBITRATION BRYAN F FOSTER,JUDGE CLERK: PATRICIA GUERRERO COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW;9396 COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY PHILIIP MYER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALFRED GRILLO. ATTORNEY THERESE A BAILEY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COUNSEL REPRESENT THAT AT THE LAST HEARING THE COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL AS TO THE ENTIRE CASE, THE MINUTES ONLY REFLECT AS TO SPECIFIC PARTIES. ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THERE IS NO ORDER ON FILE GRANTING COSTS. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.