Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
San Bernardino County Transportation Commission, A Public Agency, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Woodruff Spradlin & Smart, against Alicia A. Adcock, Trustee Of The Terry And Alicia Adcock Trust Under Trust Agreement, All Persons Unknown Claiming An Interest In The Property, Attwood, Randal J., Daniel L. Bright, Trustee Of The Daniel L. Bright Trust Under Trust Agreement, Julie'S Party Rentals, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Wilfred J. Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 08, 2016 |
CategoryEminent Domain |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions286 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time392 days |
This complaint is an amendment to a previous complaint filed by the plaintiff. The plaintiff initially designated a defendant in the complaint as "DOE 1" because they were ignorant of the true name of the defendant. However, they have now discovered ...
Order Filed Re:
Date: November 30, 2016Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: October 11, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 29, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 01, 2016Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: August 19, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 15, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 22, 2016Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: September 16, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: August 04, 2017Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: September 16, 2016Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: September 27, 2016Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: September 22, 2016Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: September 16, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 08, 2016Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: August 19, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 08, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: July 08, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2017 | |||
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 170830-0577-CK FCP/ 8.00 PAYMT 170830-0577-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 191099 | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 170830-0738-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 170830-0738-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 104509 | |
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FILED |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION FILED JUDGMENT ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION ORDERED ENTERED 08/04/17 SEE FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION FOR SPECIFICS STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER FINAL ORDER IN CONDEMNATION FILED SEE FINAL ORDER FOR SPECIFICS ACTION - COMPLETE |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLAINTIFF'S APPLC FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION,FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION FILED. |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO TERRY DON ADCOCK, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE, LORA E. ADCOCK, SUCCESSOR SOLETRUSTEE OF, TERRY D. ADCOCK, TRUSTEE OF THE TERRY AND, ALICIA A. ADCOCK, TRUSTEE OF THE TERRY AND, DANIEL L. BRIGHT, TRUSTEE OF THE DANIEL, RANDAL J. ATTWOOD, LORA E. ADCOCK, TRUSTEE OF THEROY AND, LORA E. ADCOCK, TRUSTEE OF THEROY AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
July 17, 2017 |
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AS TO JULIE'S PARTY RENTALS, LOWBROW INK. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.