Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
San Bernardino County Transportation Commission, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Woodruff Spradlin & Smart, against 2881 Hulen Place, Llc, 439 Stoddard Avenue, Llc, All Persons Unknown Claiming An Interest In The Property, At&T Communications-East, Inc., At&T Corp., (total of 22) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Keith D. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management370 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions345 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time453 days |
Disclaimer Filed
Date: January 12, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: November 10, 2016Disclaimer Filed
Date: November 08, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Disclaimer Filed
Date: August 31, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2016Disclaimer Filed
Date: January 12, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: October 02, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 16, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 16, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 16, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2016Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 06, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: July 06, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION 200918-0337-CK MJX/ 40.00 FCP/ 3.50 PAYMT 200918-0337-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 156964 | |
October 30, 2017 | |||
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF FINAL ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25. |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FILED |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION ORDERED ENTERED 10/02/17 JUDGMENT FOR: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY TRANSPORTATION JUDGMENT AGAINST: ELITE CONSERVATIONLLC, WIDEWORLD SPORTSWEAR, INC., HORIZON OXYGEN ANDMEDICAL EQUIPMENT, INC., JOHN C. BREWER, MARI-LYNN BREWER, PEACE OFFICERS FORA GREEN ENVIRONMENT, INC JUDGMENT AGAINST: TVEC, INC., WILHITE LANGLEY, INC., PIEDRAFINA MARBLE,INC. - SEE JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER (FINAL ORDER) IN CONDEMNATION FILED STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
September 29, 2017 |
Judge: Davis, Keith D |
||
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF FINAL ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT KEITH D DAVIS,JUDGE CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD SUSAN CONTACTS THE COURT ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF AND REQUESTS A CONTINUANCE OF THIS MATTER TO ALLOW TIME FOR THE COURT TO REVIEW THE ORDERS AND JUDGMENT. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/30/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. === MINUTE ORDER END === ACTION - COMPLETE |
|
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION; DECLARATIONS OF MEGHAN NIHAN, ANDREA NIETO FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.