Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Onemain Financial Group, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by The Moore Law Group, against Noriega, Manlio, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2016 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: May 11, 2016Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 11, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 11, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 11, 2016Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 22, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 08, 2016Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: September 02, 2016Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: January 20, 2017Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: January 20, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 16, 2051Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2051 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 03/13/17 AS TO MANLIO NORIEGA, FILED. |
|
May 19, 2017 | |||
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC FOR ABSTRACT 170317-0229-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 170317-0229-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK#942445 | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON MANLIO NORIEGA. |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/20/17 JUDGMENT FOR: ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST: MANLIO NORIEGA JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,080.05 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4385.05 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.