Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Johnson, Cynthia K., Lawler, Debbie Ann, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Gibson & Hughes, Pro Se, against Ahalena Hooka Lounge, Argent Retail Advisors, Augusta Development Corporation, Nai Capital, Inc., Nai Capital Management Services, Inc., (total of 9) See All represented by Law Office Of Corey E Taylor Apc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 10, 2016 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions666 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1074 days |
Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: December 12, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 08, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: April 18, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: May 04, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 07, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: May 04, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 23, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: May 04, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: May 10, 2016Statement of Damages Filed
Date: August 07, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 10, 2016Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: December 22, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 10, 2016Notice Sent re:
Date: September 27, 2018Request to Set Uncontested Matter Filed
Date: October 18, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 26, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: December 15, 2016Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: December 15, 2016Notice Sent re:
Date: June 04, 2018Request to Set Uncontested Matter Filed
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 15, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: May 04, 2018Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: May 04, 2018Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: March 07, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 30, 2017Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: February 08, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 09, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 30, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: May 25, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 09, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 10, 2016Notice Sent re:
Date: June 04, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: April 18, 2018Statement of Damages Filed
Date: March 07, 2018Assignment of Judgment Filed
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Returned Documents
Date: September 21, 2021Order signed and Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Declaration & Order re:
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Declaration of Accrued Interest in the Amount of
Date: November 10, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: November 10, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration of Accrued Interest in the Amount of
Date: December 01, 2021Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 31, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-03-15T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: April 13, 2022Notice of Bankruptcy Filed (Individual Party)
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 06, 2022Motion re:
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Orange
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Levying Officer Ntc of Writ of Execution Filed. Costs of:
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 22, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Assignment of Judgment Filed
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: June 30, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 30, 2022Objection Filed
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 18, 2022Reply Filed
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: August 30, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 22, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 30, 2022Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: October 06, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 23, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: January 03, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.