Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Riverside Healthcare & Wellness Centre,Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by De Castro Law Group, P.C., against Truley, Esther, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Wilfred J. Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilfred J. Schneider, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2016 |
CategoryCollections |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions183 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time301 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 05, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 04, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 04, 2016Comment:
Date: May 04, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: May 04, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 08, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 30, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 03, 2016Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: November 03, 2016Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: January 05, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 05, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE --CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 170502-0649-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 170502-0649-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 150387 | |
April 07, 2017 | |||
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQ FOR DOE DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DOES WERE PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 1/05/17. |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE,LLC FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE,LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/01/17 JUDGMENT FOR: RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE,LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST: ESTHER TRULEY JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $41,634.99 INTEREST $8,865.57 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $624.39 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $51124.95 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: INTEREST CALCULATION FILED BY RIVERSIDE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE,LLC | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON ESTHER TRULEY. |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.