Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Great American Insurance Company An Ohio Corporation, filed a(n) Miscellaneous Complaint (Ltd - 10K To 25K) case represented by Fallat, John Lyster, against Beauty Pools And Spas, Inc A California Corporation, March, Norman, Saad, Pierre, Superior Pools Products, Llc A Delaware Llc, Walker, James, (total of 6) See All represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael M. Dest presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2016 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Complaint (Ltd - 10K To 25K) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions192 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time571 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 21, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: March 21, 2016Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 10, 2016Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 11, 2016Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 12, 2016General Denial Filed
Date: September 02, 2016Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 23, 2016Notice Sent re:
Date: September 19, 2016Legacy Minutes
Date: September 22, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 07, 2016Legacy Minutes
Date: December 22, 2016Legacy Minutes
Date: November 22, 2016Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: February 15, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: March 09, 2017Legacy Minutes
Date: June 06, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: March 10, 2017Legacy Minutes
Date: March 10, 2017Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: July 10, 2017Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: July 10, 2017Legacy Minutes
Date: July 13, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 01, 2017Legacy Minutes
Date: September 07, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: September 07, 2017Legacy Minutes
Date: October 13, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY FOR ASBTRACT FEE 171228-0874-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 171228-0874-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 122946 | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST LIST ALL PARTIES LISTED IN JUDGMENT/ DOCUMENTS CANNOT CONTAIN WHITEOUT. |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY MICHAEL M DEST,JUDGE CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY TIMOTHY TOMLIN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 10:02 COURT ADDRESSES THE INTERPLEADER ACTION. DISBURSEMENTS FROM BOND AS FOLLOWS: BOND AMOUNT HELD IS $12,500.00. PIERRE SAAD SHALL RECOVER $6,500.00. SUPERIOR COURT CLERK IS ORDERED TO PAY $6,500.00 TO PIERRE SAAD. GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY IS AWARDED $2,378.50 IN ATTORNEY FEES AND $744.52 IN COSTS PURUSANT TO CCP SECTION 386.6 FOR A TOTAL OF $3,123.02 AND THE REMAINING UNCLAIMED FUNDS OF $2,876.98 FOR A TOTAL OF $6,000.00. SUPERIOR COURT CLERK IS ORDERED TO PAY THE AMOUNT OF $6,000.00 AND ANY ACCRUED INTEREST ON DEPOSIT TO GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. - COURT PROCEEDS WITH TRIAL. PLAINTIFF IS SEEKING THE REMAINING COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES NOT RECEIVED THROUGH THE INTERPLEADER ACTION. - PLAINTIFF REQUEST TO MOVE INTO EVIDENCE THE ORIGINAL DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY J. TOMLIN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CCP 585(D)) BY GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY AGAINST BEAUTY POOLS AND SPAS, INC AND NORMAN MARCH. - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY J. TOMLIN FILED. COURT MOVES INTO EVIDENCE THE DECLARATION OF TIMONTHY J. TOMLIN AND ATTACHMENTS, FILED TODAY, THEREIN BY REFERENCE ONLY. - COURT FINDS: JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) OF GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 10/13/17 JUDGMENT FOR: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY JUDGMENT AGAINST: BEAUTY POOLS AND SPAS, INC, NORMAN MARCH JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $4,023.50 COSTS $2,843.28 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $13366.78 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV) JUDGMENT ENTERED JUDGMENT SIGNED. ACTION - COMPLETE 10:18 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
October 13, 2017 |
Judge: Dest, Michael M |
||
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF ON INTERPLEADER, DISCHARGING BOND FILED |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY J. TOMLIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT FILED |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:WHY REMAINING PARTIES HAVE FAILED TO APPEAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.