Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pritchard, Matthew, Summer, Thomas A, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Linda Summer, Trustee Of The Thomas A. Summer Trust, Summer, Linda, Thomas A. Summer, Trustee Of The Thomas A. Summer Trust, represented by White And Bright, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David S. Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid S. Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time277 days |
Notice Imaged
Date: March 18, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 18, 2016Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 18, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 18, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: July 19, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 21, 2016At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: September 22, 2016Summons Issued on
Date: September 30, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 30, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 26, 2016Notice Sent re:
Date: October 26, 2016Motion Filed
Date: October 26, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 23, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: November 14, 2016Declaration Filed
Date: November 30, 2016Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: December 02, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 02, 2016Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: December 20, 2016Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 22, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2017 | |||
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THIS CASE WAS DISMISSED ON 12/20/16 WITH PREJUDICE. |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed NOTICE OF RULING ON ON TRIAL SETTING SUMMONS FILED. |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
December 20, 2016 |
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGS SET ONE SPECIAL INTERROGS FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS A. SUMMER, TRUSTEE OF THE THOMAS DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN;12453 COURT ATTENDANT V GARCIA - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY FREDERICK PFISTER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR THOMAS A. SUMMER, TRUSTEE OF THE THOMAS, LINDA SUMMER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: MATTER SETTLED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN;12453 COURT ATTENDANT V GARCIA - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY FREDERICK PFISTER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR THOMAS A. SUMMER, TRUSTEE OF THE THOMAS, LINDA SUMMER. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MATTHEW PRITCHARD - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS REPRESENTS THAT MATTER HAS SETTLED AND PARTIES HAVE SIGNED A SETTLEMENT. DISMISSAL TO BE FILED FORTHWITH. - COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL, PENDING SETTLEMENT. IF A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING; NO APPEARANCE IS REQUIRED AND MATTER WILL BE OFF-CALENDAR. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 01/19/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEFS' NTC OF RULING (12/05/16) & NTC OF CONTINUANCE OF TSC (12/20/16) FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.