Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
O'Neil, Connie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barry, David Neal, against Ford Motor Company A Delaware Corporation, represented by Gordon & Rees, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Thomas S. Garza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time974 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 11, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 11, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 11, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: February 17, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 27, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: June 30, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: March 01, 2017Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: May 23, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 06, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 190313-0228-CK FCP/ 2.50 PAYMT 190313-0228-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 140034 | |
November 05, 2018 | |||
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:STATUS OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CONTINUED OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED BY FORD MOTOR COMPANY. |
|
October 05, 2018 |
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY A. HANNA IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL FILED |
|
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL THOMAS S. GARZA,JUDGE CLERK: SULMA TORRES COURT REPORTER MARIANNE REID;11053 COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE COURT ATTENDANT P HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY YU YANG FOR PLAINTIFF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY TIMOTHY HANNA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR FORD MOTOR COMPANY. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF BOTH PLAINTIFF AND DEFENSE COUNSEL. REASON: PLAINTIFF IS WAITING FOR SETTLEMENT CHECK. COURT SPEAKS TO COUNSEL IN REGARDS TO PROTOCAL FOR COURT CALL APPEARANCES. - COURT REQUESTS PLAINTIFF COUNSEL FILE A DECLARATION AND PROOF OF SETTLEMENT CHECK RECEIVED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING. IF DECLARATION AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS FILED, THE NEXT HEARING MAY BE TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF DISMISSAL SET FOR 11/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S27. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.