Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by The Moore Law Group, against Osborne, Sandra, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2016 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 06, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: February 03, 2016Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 03, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 03, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 03, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 15, 2019Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: August 26, 2016Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: August 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed COPY OF NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE # 2:18-BK-21305-NB FILED. |
|
February 09, 2017 | |||
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 161222-0454-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 161222-0454-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 935507 | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON SANDRA OSBORNE. |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF DISCOVER BANK FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 08/26/16 JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK JUDGMENT AGAINST: SANDRA OSBORNE JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,776.57 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2081.57 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: ISO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE COMPLIANCE OF CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLA'S AFFIDAVIT ISO DEFAULT JUDGMENT CCP SECTION 585 FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.