Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gimbal Capital, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kenosian & Miele Llp, against Munguia, Jamie, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Barry L. Plotkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry L. Plotkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2016 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time239 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 25, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 25, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: January 25, 2016Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 25, 2016Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt of Transfer Received
Date: October 26, 2016Legacy Minutes
Date: August 16, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: August 18, 2016Notice of Transfer of Action and Request for Receipt Filed
Date: September 20, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 24, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 23, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE (CHAPTER 7) FILED. |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED BY JAMIE MUNGUIA. |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEBTOR'S NOTICE OF MEETING OF CREDITORS AND HEARIN G ON CONFORMATION ONF CH.13 PLAN FILED. |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File NOTICE OF CHAPTER 13 BANKRUPTCY CASE PLACED IN FILE |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JAMIE MUNGUIA SERVED ON 07/14/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00. |
|
January 25, 2017 | |||
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt of Transfer Received NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF FILE BY LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT DATED 10/12/16 FILED. |
|
October 17, 2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.