Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cir Law Offices Internation Llp, against Mendoza, Leticia E., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 22, 2015Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 22, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: December 22, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 22, 2015Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: June 02, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 18, 2016Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: July 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2016 | |||
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHAP 7 BANKRUPTCY--6:16-BK-15866-SC FILED BY LETICIA E. MENDOZA. |
|
June 14, 2016 | |||
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LETICIA E. MENDOZA FILED. |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF TD BANK USA, N.A. AS TO LETICIA E. MENDOZA. |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/14/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.