Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc As Assignee Of Synchronybank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, Apc, against Ellias Jr, Cristobal, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2015 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 14, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: December 14, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 14, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 14, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 12, 2016Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: January 26, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2016 | |||
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
June 06, 2016 | |||
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE - CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY FILED. |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE AS TO CHRISTOBAL ELLIAS JR FILED. |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CRISTOBAL ELLIAS JR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/29/15 WITH COSTS OF $70.00 FILED. |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.