Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Autovest, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hollins Law, against Colon Jr, Eduardo, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2015 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles
Date: December 27, 2016Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: March 24, 2016Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: April 20, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 05, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: November 05, 2015Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: December 31, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 05, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 05, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 11, 2015Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: December 30, 2015Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: December 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $40.00. |
|
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 18937.55 ) 170425-0144-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 170425-0144-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 132605 |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $129.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,114.47) |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00. |
|
October 31, 2016 | |||
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
May 02, 2016 | |||
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 17000.27 ) |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY AUTOVEST, LLC FOR WRIT FEE 160329-0387-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.