Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Harris & Zide, against Quixchan, Angela, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2015 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 05, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 05, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 05, 2015Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: November 05, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: November 05, 2015Declaration re:
Date: March 10, 2016Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: March 10, 2016Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: March 10, 2016Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: March 10, 2016Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 19, 2016Declaration re:
Date: June 05, 2018Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: June 05, 2018Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed
Date: June 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $120.00. |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: NON MILITARY STATUS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $408.76) |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 2289.44 ) 180605-0978-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180605-0978-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 24339 |
|
October 31, 2016 | |||
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING JOHNSON MARK LLP WITH HARRIS & ZIDE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR LVNV FUNDING LLC. | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC | |
May 02, 2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.