Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Garcia, Christopher, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by The Blue Law Group, Inc., against Sam'S East, Inc. An Arkansas Corporation, Sam'S West, Inc An Arkansas Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. An Arkansas Corporation (All D B A "Sam'S, represented by Pettit Kohn Ingrassia & Lutz Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Brian S. McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 23, 2015 |
CategoryPi Personal Injury Not Mv |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions144 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time573 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 23, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 23, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 23, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: October 23, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 27, 2016Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 27, 2016Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 27, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 11, 2016At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: April 04, 2016At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: June 27, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 06, 2016Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: December 06, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2017 | |||
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE ROUTED TO S30 FOR 5/31 HRG |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL | |
April 27, 2017 |
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ;12225 COURT ATTENDANT S CARR - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED PURSUANT TO A TELEPHONIC REQUEST MADE BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO AWAIT RECEIPT OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/31/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30. NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE ROUTED TO S30 FOR 4/27 HRG |
|
April 03, 2017 | |||
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.