Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Roe, John, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Zalkin Law Firm, P.C., against Redlands Unified School District, represented by Mccune & Harber Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Janet M. Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet M. Frangie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2015 |
CategoryPi Personal Injury Not Mv |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: September 22, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 22, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 23, 2015Order Filed Re:
Date: September 23, 2015Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 29, 2015Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 01, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 02, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 13, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 04, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: March 07, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 15, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 15, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: September 25, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: October 30, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 08, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 16, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: March 28, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 05, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: May 16, 2019Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: May 23, 2019Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: October 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Claim Received, Verified and Forwarded to Dept CLAIM RECEIVED VERIFIED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT S29 FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Comment: CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $1115.00 RECEIVED FROM DONNASUE SMITH ORTIZ FOR 04/10/19 TO 07/30/19. |
|
October 24, 2019 | |||
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE:DISMISSAL (SETTLMENT) |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE | |
September 09, 2019 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE:DISMISSAL (SETTLMENT) JANET M FRANGIE,JUDGE CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN;12453 COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY RYAN COHEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOHN ROE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL. COUNSEL ADVISES COURT THE ANNUITY COMPANY REQUIRED ADDITIONAL LANGUAGE AND PARTIES HAVE ALL AGREED. SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SHOULD BE SIGNED THIS DATE. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/24/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
August 05, 2019 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE:DISMISSAL (SETTLMENT) JANET M FRANGIE,JUDGE CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN;12453 COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN - APPEARANCES: RYAN COHEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOHN ROE. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: REDLANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THAT THEY HAVE RECEIVED THE SIGNED ORDER FROM THE PROBATE COURT AND ARE WOKING ON THE ANNUITY. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/09/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. === MINUTE ORDER END === ACTION - COMPLETE |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.