Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rafe Federal Credit Union, A California Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Office Of Charles A Pernice, against Rodriguez, Ismael, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Barry L. Plotkin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 12, 2015 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions176 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time362 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 12, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: August 12, 2015Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: February 04, 2016Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: August 03, 2016Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 12, 2015Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: August 03, 2016Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 12, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 02, 2015Legacy Minutes
Date: August 05, 2016Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: August 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2016 | |||
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY RAFE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, A CALIFORNIA FOR ABSTRACT 160822-0901-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 160822-0901-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 5426 | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF RAFE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, A CALIFORNIA FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF RAFE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, A CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 08/08/16 JUDGMENT FOR: RAFE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, A CALIFORNIA JUDGMENT AGAINST: ISMAEL RODRIGUEZ JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,417.10 INTEREST $60.32 ATTORNEY FEES $1,091.70 COSTS $351.70 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10920.82 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 BARRY L PLOTKIN,JUDGE CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFF. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:46 MATTER ON FOR ONE YEAR REVIEW. HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. REASON: 585 SUBMITTED BY PRIORITY MAIL ON 08/03/16. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/06/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35. CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35 COURT MAKES ANNOUNCEMENT REGARDING MOVING OF S35'S COURTROOM AND CALENDAR TO S17 AT THE SAN BERNARDINO JUSTICE CENTER. ACTION - COMPLETE 08:48 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
August 05, 2016 |
Judge: Plotkin, Barry L |
||
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF RAFE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, A CALIFORNIA AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON ISMAEL RODRIGUEZ. |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF ANGEL CARRILLO RE: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.