Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Shepherd, Evelyn, Shepherd Jr., Lawrence E, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Westphal Law Group, against All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or, All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or In, Shepherd, Evelyn, Shepherd Jr., Lawrence E., represented by Sanders Law Group, Westphal Law Group, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Bryan F. Foster presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 14, 2015 |
CategoryQuiet Title |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions892 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time962 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 14, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: July 14, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 14, 2015Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: December 15, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 15, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: December 15, 2015Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 15, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 15, 2015At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 21, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 05, 2016At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: June 14, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: September 18, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 26, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 26, 2017Motion Filed
Date: September 26, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: December 22, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 02, 2018Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0077233946 | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 180717-0505-VS MJF/ 25.00 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY LAWRENCE E SHEPHERD JR, FOR $778.40. |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEFAULT JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE FILED |
|
March 02, 2018 |
Judge: Foster, Bryan |
||
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes DEFAULT HEARING BRYAN F FOSTER,JUDGE CLERK: PATRICIA GUERRERO COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW;9396 COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY WESLEY WESTPHAL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD 09:13 ABOVE MATTER PROCEEDS AS DEFAULT. LAWRENCE E SHEPERD JR IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF. 09:29 WITNESS LAWRENCE E SHEPERD JR EXCUSED. - COURT FINDS: JUDGMENT ON QUIET TITLE OF LAWRENCE E SHEPHERD JR ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT FOR LAWRENCE E SHEPHERD JR JUDGMENT AGAINST EVELYN SHEPHERD, ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR ALL EXHIBITS RETURNED TO PARTIES THIS DATE WITH ORDER TO RETAIN IN TRIAL CONDITION UNTIL THE EXPIRATION OF ANY APPEAL PERIOD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEFAULT PROVE UP BRIEF FILED |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT - JUDGE BRYAN F FOSTER DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE) | |
January 29, 2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.