Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Align Claims Services, Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bates Winter & Mistretta Llp, against Monarcas Pallets, represented by Murchison & Cumming, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael A. Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2015 |
CategoryPersonal Injury-Non Motor Vehicle(Ltd) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time422 days |
Notice Imaged
Date: July 14, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 14, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 14, 2015Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 18, 2015At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 24, 2015At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 23, 2016Notice Sent re:
Date: March 25, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Consolidated Master File: CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) CIVDS1504536, CIVDS1603690, CIVDS1613546 MASTER FILE CIVDS1504536 STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- CONSOLIDATED. DISPOSITION: CONSOLIDATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/28/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28. |
|
July 28, 2016 | |||
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: TSC/(CONSOLIDATION W/CIVDS1504536 & CIVDS1603690) |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY MONARCAS PALLETS | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALIGN CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.. | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CONTINUED TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE/HRG FILED BY MONARCAS PALLETS. |
|
May 18, 2016 |
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: TSC/(CONSOLIDATION W/CIVDS1504536 & CIVDS1603690) MICHAEL A SACHS,JUDGE CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW;9396 COURT ATTENDANT R WILSON - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MARK BATES APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALIGN CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.. ATTORNEY GREGORY SARGENTI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MONARCAS PALLETS. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COUNSEL ADVISE THE COURT OF PENDING MEDIATION SCHEDULED FOR 6/30/16. COUNSEL FURTHER INDICATE ADDITIONAL RELATED MATTER HAS BEEN FILED OR WILL BE FILED. COURT CONTINUES MATTER TO 7/28/16 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT S28. LAW OFFICE OF MURCHISON & CUMMING TO GIVE NOTICE. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/28/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
April 07, 2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.