Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cotoi, Viorca, Halligan Jr., Justin B, Halligan Sr., Justin B., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Harshbarger Law, against Arevalo, Frank Armando, Roly'S Trucking, Inc., Roly'S Trucking, Inc, A California Corporation, represented by Meyers Mcconnell Reisz Siderman, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Bryan F. Foster presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBryan F. Foster Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 08, 2015 |
CategoryPi Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions390 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time587 days |
Guardian Ad Litem Added for
Date: May 11, 2015Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 08, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 08, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: May 08, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 11, 2015Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: June 01, 2016Order to Deposit Money Filed.
Date: September 14, 2016Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: February 22, 2031Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2031 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS IN NEWSPAPER COUNTY LEGAL REPORTER FOR FRANK ARMANDO AREVALO FILED |
|
January 04, 2017 | |||
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SANCTIONS |
|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 11/16/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22. |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/04/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22. |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt & Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED. PRESENT BALANCE $105,007.34; BANK WELLS FARGO-SALT LAKE CITY UTAH |
|
November 16, 2016 |
Judge: Foster, Bryan |
||
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 11/16/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22. BRYAN F FOSTER,JUDGE CLERK: PATRICIA GUERRERO COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ;10911 COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: 08:33 PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD NO PROOF OF DEPOSIT HAS BEEN SUBMITTED. - THE COURT CONTINUES THE HEARING AS FOLLOWS: - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/04/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22. CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF 11/16/16 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed NOTICE OF RULING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.