Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Colucci, Stephen, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Barrera & Associates Apc, against Colucci, Stephen, Robson, Brian, T-Mobile Usa, Inc A Delaware Corporation, represented by Allen, Matkins, Leck, Gamble & Mallory, Allen Matkins Leckgamble Mallory & Natsis, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2015 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 28, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 29, 2016Reply Filed
Date: November 16, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 06, 2017Reply Filed
Date: November 16, 2016Points and Authorities Filed
Date: October 28, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 28, 2016Answer Filed
Date: December 18, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 28, 2016Declaration Filed
Date: October 28, 2016Motion Filed
Date: October 26, 2016Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 06, 2016Motion Filed
Date: October 26, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 26, 2016Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: October 28, 2016Answer Filed
Date: April 13, 2015Reply Filed
Date: January 06, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 01, 2015Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 16, 2015Reply Filed
Date: November 21, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 06, 2017Declaration re:
Date: November 16, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 06, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 28, 2016Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 28, 2016Reply Filed
Date: January 06, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 09, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 12, 2017Reply Filed
Date: October 06, 2015Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: February 27, 2015Points and Authorities Filed
Date: September 08, 2015Motion Filed
Date: September 08, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: February 27, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 08, 2015Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 13, 2015Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: August 12, 2015Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: August 12, 2015At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 12, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 13, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 04, 2016Declaration re:
Date: January 06, 2017Objection Filed
Date: January 06, 2017Declaration re:
Date: January 10, 2018Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: February 06, 2018Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: February 16, 2018Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed
Date: February 27, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 27, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 18, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 17, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 01, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 25, 2018Motion Filed
Date: August 26, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 22, 2020Remittitur Filed
Date: August 13, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 10, 2018Reply Filed
Date: January 25, 2018Reply Filed
Date: March 02, 2018Reply Filed
Date: September 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 09, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 09, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: July 26, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Stipulation Filed re:
Date: August 28, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 27, 2015Declaration Filed
Date: July 26, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Declaration re:
Date: August 03, 2017Trial Brief Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: August 04, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 07, 2017Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 26, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 26, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Reply Filed
Date: August 07, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 01, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 10, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 07, 2017Trial Brief Filed
Date: August 07, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Amended Document Filed re:
Date: February 03, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 04, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 09, 2017Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 03, 2017Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 07, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: April 26, 2017Motion in Limine re:
Date: May 22, 2017Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 26, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 03, 2017Motion Filed
Date: July 24, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 30, 2017Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 26, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: July 26, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: July 26, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: May 04, 2017Motion in Limine re:
Date: May 22, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 22, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 10, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 20, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 20, 2017Reply Filed
Date: November 30, 2017Motion Filed
Date: November 14, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2017Points and Authorities Filed
Date: November 20, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 27, 2015Exhibits List Filed
Date: September 25, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 28, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 28, 2017Declaration re:
Date: January 04, 2018Declaration re:
Date: November 08, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: October 25, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 26, 2017Points and Authorities Filed
Date: November 08, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 26, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 30, 2017Motion Filed
Date: December 22, 2017Reply Filed
Date: December 07, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 30, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 30, 2017Reply Filed
Date: January 04, 2018Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 04, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 20, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 12, 2017Memorandum of Costs
Date: October 26, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 20, 2017Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 20, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 08, 2017Reply Filed
Date: December 11, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 08, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: January 08, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 09, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: November 14, 2017Declaration re:
Date: November 20, 2017Objection Filed
Date: November 28, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 10, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 27, 2015Subpoenaed Records Released to Parties in Dept & Rcpt Filed
Date: August 31, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: September 21, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: November 09, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: November 13, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: November 13, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 20, 2017Objection Filed
Date: January 10, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 10, 2018Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: February 06, 2018Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: February 20, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: February 26, 2018Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: February 28, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: February 27, 2018Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: March 19, 2018Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: April 03, 2018Document(s) Placed in File
Date: April 12, 2018Document(s) Placed in File
Date: April 23, 2018Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: May 01, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 10, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 14, 2018Notice to Court Reporter(s) to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: May 17, 2018Record on Appeal Certified to Reviewing Court & Parties
Date: August 16, 2018Notice
Date: January 06, 2021Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied
Date: February 02, 2021Notice of Destruction of Exhibits Mailed to Parties
Date: February 19, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 23, 2021Order for Destruction of Exhibits Signed
Date: April 30, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 16, 2017Document(s) Placed in File
Date: February 15, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: June 01, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 15, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 30, 2020Notice Sent re:
Date: October 02, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.