Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hussain, Syed Sajjad, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Ejike, Ugo-Harris Peter, Law Office Of Ugo Harris P Ejike, against All Parties, Per Sons Or Entities Known Andunknown Claiming Any Interest Whatsoever In, All Parties, Persons Or Entities Known And Unkown Claiming Any Interest Whatsoever In The, Mant Construction Services Corporation, Sharma, Pankaj, Tyagi, Anil Kumar, (total of 6) See All represented by Riley, Terrence Francis, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Brian S. McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S. McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2015 |
CategoryFraud |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time575 days |
Notice Imaged
Date: January 24, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: January 14, 2019Request To Preserve Exhibits Filed
Date: October 15, 2018Receipt for Records filed
Date: September 22, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: October 26, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: November 03, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 05, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 15, 2019Notice of Destruction of Exhibits Mailed to Parties
Date: September 14, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: May 11, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 04, 2018Receipt of Records/Exhibits filed
Date: January 04, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 24, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: July 26, 2017Subpoenaed Records Released to Parties in Dept & Rcpt Filed
Date: April 24, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 24, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 11, 2016Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: July 01, 2016Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 14, 2017Comment: (Imaged)
Date: October 24, 2016Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: July 01, 2016Comment: (Imaged)
Date: September 29, 2016Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 30, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 21, 2016Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: July 01, 2016Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: July 01, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 10, 2016Comment: (Imaged)
Date: May 02, 2016Comment: (Imaged)
Date: June 16, 2016Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 08, 2015Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 10, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: July 08, 2015Comment: (Imaged)
Date: May 02, 2016Comment: (Imaged)
Date: May 02, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 01, 2016Declaration re:
Date: April 01, 2016Motion Filed
Date: April 01, 2016Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 07, 2016Comment: (Imaged)
Date: March 15, 2016Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 10, 2016Notice Imaged
Date: March 08, 2016Order Filed Re:
Date: July 13, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 08, 2015Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 14, 2016Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: January 14, 2016Comment: (Imaged)
Date: January 04, 2016Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 08, 2015Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 24, 2015Notice Imaged
Date: February 24, 2015Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 24, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 24, 2015Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 24, 2015Notice of Destruction of Preserved Exhibits Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Destruction of Preserved Exhibits Filed | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGMENT FOR $39,000.00 IS LISTED ONLY AS TO ANIL KUMAR TYAGI AND MANT CONTRUCTION SERVICES. |
|
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ALL JUDGMENT DEBTORS MUST BE LISTED ON FRONT AND BACK.. |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent re: NOTICE OF RETURNED ABSTRACT SENT. ABSTRACT IS RETURNED DUE TO INCORRECT JUDGMENT DEBTORS ON BACK. ALSO, CHANGES WERE MADE TO ABSTRACT AND INITIALS BY ALL THE CHANGES ARE NEEDED OR RESUBMIT WITH A NEW ABSTRACT. |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRESERVE EXHIBITS FILED. | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ALL JUDGMENT DEBTORS MUST BE LISTED ON ABSTRACT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.