Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sellers, William Lee, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate case against Registrar Of Contractors Contractors State License Board Department Of Consumer, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David S. Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid S. Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2014 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time267 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 09, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 20, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 09, 2014Notice Imaged
Date: September 09, 2014Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 03, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 03, 2015Comment:
Date: June 03, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:ENTRY OF WRIT AND JUDGMENT DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI;13302 COURT ATTENDANT I ROMO - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY D M PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY MICHAEL BROWN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - THE COURT INDICATES THAT THE ORDERS ON THIS MATTER HAVE BEEN SIGNED. OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: ORDERS SIGNED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed JUDGMENT GRANTING PREEMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS FILED. JUDGMENT ON MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF WILLIAM LEE SELLERS ORDERED ENTERED 06/03/15 JUDGMENT FOR: WILLIAM LEE SELLERS JUDGMENT AGAINST: REGISTRAR OF CONTRACTORS CONTRACTORS A PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. THE WRIT SHALL COMMAND RESPONDENT TO REISSUE WILLIAM LEE SELLERS'S STATE PLUMBING LICENSE SEE SIGNED JUDGMENT FOR SPECIFICS STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV) |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT GRANTING PEREMPTORY WRIT FILED BY WILLIAM LEE SELLERS. |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Comment: PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDAMUS ISSUED |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Comment: CERTIFIED COPY OF ROA SENT TO CAL DOJ, ATTORNEY GE NERALS OFFICE MAILED PER FAX REQUEST |
|
April 24, 2015 |
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: GAIL ANDERSON COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON;11800 COURT ATTENDANT I ROMO - ATTORNEY INFORMATION ATTORNEY D. M. DAVIS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PLAINTIFF WILLIAM LEE SELLERS PRESENT ATTORNEY MICHAEL BROWN PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - WILLIAM LEE SELLERS'S MOTION /PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE IS HEARD. ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. - WILLIAM LEE SELLERS'S MOTION /PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE IS GRANTED. A WRIT SHALL ISSUE DIRECTING THE RESPONDENT TO RESCING ANY REVOCATION ORDER EXISTING AGAINST PETITIONER. (PARTIES ADVISE THAT ALTHOUGH RULING ISSUED, NO REVOCATION HAS TAKEN PLACE AND PETITIONER'S LICENSE WAS RENEWED IN 2014.) - COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER TO PREPARE WRIT (IF NEEDED) AND PROPOSED JUDGMENT. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : ENTRY OF WRIT AND JUDGMENT SET FOR 06/05/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37. NOTICE WAIVED. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed LODGING OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - FILED. |
|
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF - FILED. |
|
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PETITIONER'S OPENING BRIEF - FILED. (IMAGED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.