Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Delaavila Garcia, Francisco, Vega, Nicolas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hanassab, Fariborz Fred, Sottile Baltaxe, against Cabrera'S Truck & Trailer Repair, Cortex Transport Inc, Cortez, Valentin, E Tec Of California, Tec Of California Inc., (total of 10) See All represented by Chapman Glucksman Dean Roeb & Barger, Samuel Crowe & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Bryan Foster presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBryan Foster Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2014 |
CategoryPi Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions578 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: July 01, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 01, 2014Notice Imaged
Date: December 08, 2014Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 03, 2015Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 03, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 03, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 03, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 13, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 03, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2015Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 01, 2015Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 24, 2015Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 03, 2015At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 22, 2016Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: March 01, 2017Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: March 01, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: May 11, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 14, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 14, 2017Stipulation Filed re:
Date: May 11, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: May 11, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: May 12, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: May 22, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: June 20, 2017Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 28, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 02, 2021Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied
Date: January 28, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.