Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mortgage Guaranty Insurance Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gaba Law Corporation, against Calinisan, Jeremias, Calinisan, Lydia, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2014 |
CategoryUnlimited Collections |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 16, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 16, 2014Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 16, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
November 13, 2014 | |||
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JEREMIAS CALINISAN SERVED ON 06/07/14 WITH FEES OF $49.00. |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LYDIA CALINISAN SERVED ON 06/07/14 WITH FEES OF $49.00. |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S27J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.