Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Foreman Financial Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Blundo, Frank George, against Suniga, Joseph E., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2014 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: May 16, 2014Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 13, 2014Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: August 28, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 16, 2014Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 16, 2014Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: August 20, 2014Assignment of Judgment
Date: April 01, 2015Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: October 22, 2015Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATIFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00. |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE RE JOSEPH EDWARD SUNIGA, #6:15-BK-22395-MH FILED. |
|
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR LOS ANGELES COUNTY 151023-2786-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 151023-2786-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 16530 | |
October 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 10409.60 ) |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,050.69) |
|
May 21, 2015 | |||
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC. FILED ADDING PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT. | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING ALLEN AVANESSIAN WITH FRANK BLUNDO AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR FOREMAN FINANCIAL INC.. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.