Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates,Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pierce, Emily Dehaas, against Brady, Quovonna, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2014 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: May 16, 2014Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 16, 2014Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 16, 2014Declaration Filed
Date: May 16, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2015 | |||
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
November 10, 2014 | |||
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/21/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25. |
|
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled For: HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/10/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25J |
|
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.